NH SB297 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0160; Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0160; Effective 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to obtaining out-of-state discovery and testimony.
Title
Relative to obtaining out-of-state discovery and testimony.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Rep. Edward Gordon [R] |
Rep. Mark McLean [R] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2022; Chapter 0160; Effective 01/01/2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/26/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |