NH SB296 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Subcommittee Work Session: 06/15/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Subcommittee Work Session: 06/15/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to complaint procedures in cases before the commission for human rights.
Title
Relative to complaint procedures in cases before the commission for human rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/15/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-05-04 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 04/14/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-30 | House | Public Hearing: 04/07/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |