NH SB274 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 177-154 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 177-154 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to governmental construction contracts.
Title
Relative to governmental construction contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. Brian Seaworth [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] |
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - ITL (Y: 177 N: 154 NV: 19 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 177-154 05/04/2022 House Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-27 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0429s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2022-0429s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2022, Room 103, State House, 01:20 pm; Senate Calendar 50 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |