NH SB258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the graves of African Americans alive during the period of American enslavement.
Title
Relative to the graves of African Americans alive during the period of American enslavement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | Interim Study Full Committee Work Session: 06/22/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-05-05 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 180-146 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) |
2022-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/20/2022 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 04/06/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-03-23 | House | Introduced 03/17/2022 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0664s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-0664s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Special Order to after the Committee on Education, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/16/2022; Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0664s, 02/16/2022; Senate Calendar 7 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2021-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |