NH SB246 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of "teacher" for the purpose of renomination or reelection.
Title
Relative to the definition of "teacher" for the purpose of renomination or reelection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Hearing: 9/22/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 34 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/3/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 6 |