NH SB21 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/10; Chapter 0195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/10; Chapter 0195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exemptions from excavating and drainage permits.
Title
Relative to exemptions from excavating and drainage permits.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/10; Chapter 0195 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Sen. Odell Concurs with House Amendment #1845h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.536 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1845h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1535-1536 | |
2011-05-18 | House Amendment #1845h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1535-1536 | |
2011-05-12 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1845h; House Calendar 39, PG.1338-1339 | |
2011-05-12 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1845h for May 18 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1321 | |
2011-05-04 | House Executive Session: 5/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-04-26 | House =CANCELLED= Executive Session: 5/3/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-23 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/29/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 19, Pg. 438 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0176s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 5, Pg.56 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 0176s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 5, Pg.56 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0176s, New Title, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-05 | Senate Hearing: 1/13/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2011-01-04 | Senate Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 1, Pg.20 |