NH SB206 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/29/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/29/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting corporal punishment in child day care agencies.
Title
Prohibiting corporal punishment in child day care agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Becky Whitley [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
Rep. Mark McLean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0146; Effective 08/29/2023 |
2023-06-20 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 14 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-1973e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/18/2023); Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-1973e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/18/2023 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 3 |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/28/2023 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/28/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/28/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9A |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |