NH SB173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0086
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming January 24, 2012 as Granny D. Day.
Title
Proclaiming January 24, 2012 as Granny D. Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0086 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318 | |
2011-05-04 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490 | |
2011-04-27 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 240-48; House Journal 40, PG.1384-1386 | |
2011-04-27 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep DeLemus); House Journal 40, PG.1352 | |
2011-04-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 27 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1067 | |
2011-04-05 | House Executive Session: 4/19/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 28, Pg.883 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 7, Pg.78 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 0357s, 0370s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.76 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Sen. Barnes Floor Amendment #2011-0370s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.76 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0357s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.76 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0357s, 2/23/11; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Hearing: 2/15/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs, Senate Journal 3, Pg.39 |