NH SB14 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2013; Chapter 0166; Effective 06/27/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2013; Chapter 0166; Effective 06/27/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rulemaking authority of and administrative fine authority for the department of resources and economic development.
Title
Relative to the rulemaking authority of and administrative fine authority for the department of resources and economic development.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] | Rep. Chris Muns [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Rep. David Borden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2013; Chapter 0166; Effective 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1574 |
2013-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 5 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1429 |
2013-05-22 | House | Executive Session: 5/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-05-15 | House | Public Hearing: 5/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 41, PG.1392 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1392 |
2013-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1199 |
2013-04-17 | House | Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 ==Or One Hour Following House Session== |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-04-03 | House | Vacated from Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1073 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0226s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0226s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-7 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 0226s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0226s, 2/14/13; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 1/16/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |