NH SB122 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to expenditures from the energy efficiency fund.
Title
Relative to expenditures from the energy efficiency fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Cali-Pitts [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] |
Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1728h (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-21 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-07-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-06-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0829s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-0863s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0829s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0829s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB122 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate