NH SB105 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2011; Effective 06/08/2011; Chapter 0154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2011; Effective 06/08/2011; Chapter 0154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting highway trail crossing from evaluation requirements for certain all terrain and trail bike trails.
Title
Exempting highway trail crossing from evaluation requirements for certain all terrain and trail bike trails.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Fields [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Yvonne Thomas [D] |
Rep. Marc Tremblay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2011; Effective 06/08/2011; Chapter 0154 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1537 | |
2011-05-04 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1322 | |
2011-04-26 | House Executive Session: 5/3/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-23 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/29/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.162 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0787s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.116 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 0787s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.116 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0787s, New Title, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.36 |