NH HB665 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New Hampshire cost-of-living information.
Title
Relative to New Hampshire cost-of-living information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 4 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 3 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 24 |