NH HB606 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 98; Eff: 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 98; Eff: 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting services provided without renumeration from license requirements for barbering, cosmetology, and esthetics.
Title
Exempting services provided without renumeration from license requirements for barbering, cosmetology, and esthetics.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Kurt Wuelper [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Tim Baxter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 98; Eff: 08/30/2021 |
2021-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 23 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/05/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 200-166 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 73 |
2021-04-08 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Grote): Motion Failed DV 176-192 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 73 |
2021-03-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 46 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/11/2021 01:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/91078617911 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 56 |