NH HB602 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB602
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to landfill siting.
Title
Relative to landfill siting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/28/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB602 (Carry Over) 2023-03-01 - Retained in Committee