NH HB60 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.367
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the moratorium on school building aid projects.
Title
Repealing the moratorium on school building aid projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.367 | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 25-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.235 | |
2011-01-31 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/14/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-30 | House Executive Session Following House Session: Feb 9 Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-25 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/1/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-25 | House Division II Work Session: 1/28/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-11 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/12/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2010-12-22 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 8, PG.129 |