NH HB569 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-28 - House Signed by the Governor 07/23/2010; Effective 07/23/2010; Chapter 0363

Summary

Clarifying insurance coverage for diagnosis and treatment of pervasive developmental disorder or autism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying insurance coverage for diagnosis and treatment of pervasive developmental disorder or autism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-28 House Signed by the Governor 07/23/2010; Effective 07/23/2010; Chapter 0363
2010-06-02 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 21, Pg.776
2010-06-02 House Enrolled
2010-05-19 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1906s (Rep Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2224
2010-05-05 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 17, Pg.398
2010-05-05 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1906s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17, Pg.394
2010-05-05 Senate Sen. Hassan Floor Amendment 1906s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.394
2010-05-05 Senate Committee Amendment 1429s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.393
2010-05-05 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1429s, New Title, 5/5/10
2010-05-05 Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order prior to Public & Munic; Senate Journal 17, Pg.392
2010-05-05 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1429s, New Title, 5/5/10
2010-05-05 Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to the end of calendar; Senate Journal 17, Pg.384
2010-05-05 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1429s, New Title, 5/5/10
2010-05-05 Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to the end of ED & A; Senate Journal 17, Pg.360
2010-04-28 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1429s, New Title, 5/5/10
2010-04-28 Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to 05/5/10; Senate Journal 16, Pg.333
2010-04-21 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1429s, New Title, 4/28/10
2010-04-21 Senate Without Objection, Chair moved to Special Order to 04/28/10; Senate Journal 15, Pg.303
2010-04-15 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1429s, New Title, 4/21/10; Senate Calendar 16
2010-04-01 Senate Hearing: April 6, 2010, Room 210-211, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14
2010-03-03 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Labor and Consumer Protection
2010-01-06 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2462h (New Title): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-147; House Journal 6, PG.280-283
2010-01-06 House Amendment #2462h (New Title) Adopted, Division Vote 184-155; House Journal 6, PG.281
2009-11-24 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 2, PG.90
2009-11-24 House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2462h (New Title); House Calendar 1, PG.27-28
2009-11-24 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2462h (NT) for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 13-3); House Calendar 2, PG.90
2009-10-28 House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/12/2009 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00AM)==
2009-10-27 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2009 9:50 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-10-03 House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/3/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-10-02 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-10-01 House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/28/2009 Legislative Office Building 302 1:00 PM
2009-09-30 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-09-09 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/7/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-08-26 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-04-14 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/16/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-03-31 House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/2/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-03-18 House Retained in Committee
2009-03-12 House Executive Session: 3/17/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 (Continued 3/18/09 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 If Needed)
2009-03-11 House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/13/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-02-10 House Public Hearing: 3/9/2009 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2009-01-08 House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.233

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback