NH HB568 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-04 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to smoking within certain areas of New Hampshire state parks and historic sites.
Title
Relative to smoking within certain areas of New Hampshire state parks and historic sites.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bolster [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.422 | |
2011-11-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 13-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2209 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-07-26 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-02-22 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |