NH HB563 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of school administrative unit budgets.
Title
Relative to the adoption of school administrative unit budgets.
Sponsors
Rep. John Sellers [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Vanessa Sheehan [R] | Rep. Erica Layon [R] |
Rep. Jim Creighton [R] | Rep. Louise Andrus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 5 |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB563-FN-LOCAL 02/24/2023 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5 |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 20 |