NH HB557 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the standards and burden of proof with respect to the business profits tax deduction for reasonable compensation attributable to owners of partnerships, limited liability companies, and sole proprietorships.
Title
Relative to the standards and burden of proof with respect to the business profits tax deduction for reasonable compensation attributable to owners of partnerships, limited liability companies, and sole proprietorships.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] |
Rep. Paul Mirski [R] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - House - OTP/AM 0757H (Y: 238 N: 77 NV: 83 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.348 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17, Pg.347 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17, Pg.347 | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/18/11; Senate Calendar 24 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1716s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee Amendment 1716s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1716s, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Hearing: 4/5/11, Room 100, State House, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193 | |
2011-03-17 | House Reconsideration (Rep Stepanek): Motion Failed Division Vote 72-243; House Journal 30, PG.1013-1014 | |
2011-03-17 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0757h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 238-77; House Journal 30, PG.1010-1013 | |
2011-03-17 | House Amendment #0757h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1010-1011 | |
2011-03-09 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 22, PG.571-572 | |
2011-03-09 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-0757h; House Calendar 23, PG.641-642 | |
2011-03-09 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0757h for Mar 15 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.571-572 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 2:00 PM)== | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |