NH HB555 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 96; Eff: 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 96; Eff: 08/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prisoners' voting rights.
Title
Relative to prisoners' voting rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Bouldin [D] | Rep. Cam Kenney [D] | Rep. Allison Nutting-Wong [D] | Rep. Donald Bouchard [D] |
Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2021; Chapter 96; Eff: 08/30/2021 |
2021-06-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24A |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/10/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 12 |
2021-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 9 |
2021-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/99327579520 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:10 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 10:30 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/95842759377Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 53 |