NH HB518 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2021; Chapter 171; Eff: 09/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2021; Chapter 171; Eff: 09/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rebates under the law governing unfair insurance practices.
Title
Relative to rebates under the law governing unfair insurance practices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/30/2021; Chapter 171; Eff: 09/28/2021 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1411s (Rep. Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 1 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1411s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1411s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1411s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 6 |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 5 |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98917516497 (if necessary) |
2021-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95215897452 |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 52 |