NH HB517 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Seaworth): Motion Adopted DV 191-158 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Seaworth): Motion Adopted DV 191-158 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.
Title
Relative to the state minimum hourly rate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Seaworth): Motion Adopted DV 191-158 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 10/19/2021 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) |
2021-11-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB517-FN 10/19/2021 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 36 |
2021-09-23 | House | Executive Session: 09/23/2021 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2021-08-04 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 09/16/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-03-04 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92992494588 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following linkTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93123047403 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 52 |
Same As/Similar To
HB517 (Carry Over) 2021-09-23 - Executive Session: 09/23/2021 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB517 |