NH HB501 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2856h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a cost of care fund to assist municipalities caring for animals during animal cruelty cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a cost of care fund to assist municipalities caring for animals during animal cruelty cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2856h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
2019-10-11HouseExecutive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-06House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback