NH HB501 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB501

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Using fees from registration of commercial animal food sellers to fund the cost of care program in the department of agriculture, markets, and food and establishing a commission to study the identification of unregistered animal feed products being sold remotely in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Using fees from registration of commercial animal food sellers to fund the cost of care program in the department of agriculture, markets, and food and establishing a commission to study the identification of unregistered animal feed products being sold remotely in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0675h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 66
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0675h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 66
2020-03-04HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0675h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 31
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-12HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 41
2020-01-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2856h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 41
2020-01-08HouseAmendment # 2019-2856h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 41
2019-11-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2856h (NT) (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50
2019-10-11HouseExecutive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-10-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-06House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 12:45 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-30HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 17

Same As/Similar To

HB501 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2856h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback