NH HB490 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to modifying the definition of neglect.
Title
Relative to modifying the definition of neglect.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB490 02/07/2023 (Vote 14-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 3 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law |