NH HB479 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 237; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 237; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to uninsured or hit-and-run motor vehicle coverage and relative to the New Hampshire excellence in higher education endowment trust fund.
Title
Relative to uninsured or hit-and-run motor vehicle coverage and relative to the New Hampshire excellence in higher education endowment trust fund.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 237; Effective Date 9/11/2015 |
2015-06-29 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1477s (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1477s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1477s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1477s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1477s, New Title, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Hearing: 4/28/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m., on proposed non-germane amendment #2015-1369s - an act relative to uninsured or hit-and-run motor vehicle coverage and relative to the New Hampshire excellence in higher education endowment trust fund to HB 479 - relative to uninsured or hit-and-run motor vehicle coverage. Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/16/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 772 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 393 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 225 |