NH HB432 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 142; Eff: 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 142; Eff: 09/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the offenses that prevent employment in a school.
Title
Relative to the offenses that prevent employment in a school.
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Mullen [D] | Rep. James Allard [R] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] |
Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1116s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1113s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1116s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1113s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 142; Eff: 09/21/2021 |
2021-07-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1113s (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 9 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1113s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2021-1116s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1113s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Sen. Watters Moved to Remove HB 432 from the Consent Calendar; 04/08/2021; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1113s, 04/08/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18A |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/23/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0015h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0015h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0015h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 48 |