NH HB425 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 234; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 234; Effective Date 9/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures for the adoption of agency rules under the administrative procedures act.
Title
Relative to procedures for the adoption of agency rules under the administrative procedures act.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. David Kidder [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. John Sytek [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 234; Effective Date 9/11/2015 |
2015-06-29 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2190EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1993 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2190e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1273s (Rep A. Christie): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1813 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1273s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1273s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1273s, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1273s, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing: 4/8/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 786 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 400 |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 223 |