NH HB405 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to dissolving corporations.
Title
Relative to dissolving corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 2, Pg.36 | |
2012-01-03 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14, Pg.275 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/27/11; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Hearing: 4/19/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11, Pg.192 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.702 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.525 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-16 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-01 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-26 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 185 |