NH HB342 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 12; Eff: 06/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the taking of game by certain lever-action firearms and relative to the number of rounds permitted in a firearm used to take deer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the taking of game by certain lever-action firearms and relative to the number of rounds permitted in a firearm used to take deer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 12; Eff: 06/22/2021
2021-04-12SenateEnrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12
2021-04-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-17SenateRemote Hearing: 03/22/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0136h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 9
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0136h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 9
2021-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0136h (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 7
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2021 01:30 pm Remote info same as above
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94410519799 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback