NH HB319 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB319
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2777h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2777h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Friends of Seabrook Rail Trail to issue decals for multi-use plates.
Title
Authorizing Friends of Seabrook Rail Trail to issue decals for multi-use plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2777h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-09-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-09-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 45 |
Same As/Similar To
HB319 (Carry Over) 2019-10-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2777h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)