NH HB315 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/26/2021; Chapter 229; I. Sec. 1-10 Eff: 10/25/2021 II. Rem. Eff: 08/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/26/2021; Chapter 229; I. Sec. 1-10 Eff: 10/25/2021 II. Rem. Eff: 08/26/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the aggregation of electric customers and municipal host customer generators serving political subdivisions.
Title
Relative to the aggregation of electric customers and municipal host customer generators serving political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Cali-Pitts [D] | Rep. Michael Harrington [R] | Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/26/2021; Chapter 229; I. Sec. 1-10 Eff: 10/25/2021 II. Rem. Eff: 08/26/2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2066eba: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2066e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-1987c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-1987c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-1987c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-06-14 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 06/14/2021 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Bradley, Watters; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1294s and 2021-1400s and Requests CofC (Reps. Vose, Harrington, Thomas, Cali-Pitts): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 52 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Sen. Avard Floor Amendment # 2021-1400s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2021-1294s and 2021-1400s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1294s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1294s, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/26/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0748h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 42 |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment # 2021-0748h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 42 |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0748h (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 59 |
2021-03-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/19/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93683395113 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96232478698 |
2021-02-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95412375991 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-22 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/22/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following links: 1. 1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91732382660 |
2021-02-03 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98218369454 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 43 |