NH HB267 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB267
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-05 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal records checks in school employment.
Title
Relative to criminal records checks in school employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/03/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 9 |
Same As/Similar To
HB267 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36