NH HB267 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB267
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Lay HB267 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Lay HB267 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 97
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal records checks in school employment.
Title
Relative to criminal records checks in school employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Lay HB267 on Table (Rep. Ladd): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 97 |
2023-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2317h |
2023-11-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 11/13/2023 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 27 |
2023-10-10 | House | Executive Session: 11/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-10-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 41 |
2023-09-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36 |
2023-05-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/03/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 9 |
Same As/Similar To
HB267 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 36