NH HB241 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB241
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 09/22/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Fish and Game and Marine Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 09/22/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
Pending: House Fish and Game and Marine Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to trout.
Title
Relative to trout.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 09/22/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2021-08-17 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-04-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/28/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97783276704 |
2021-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2021 01:30 pm Remote info same as above |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94410519799 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB241 (Carry Over) 2021-09-22 - Executive Session: 09/22/2021 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307