NH HB239 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 207; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 207; Eff: 09/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements for supervision for licensure of certain mental health anddrug counselors.
Title
Relative to requirements for supervision for licensure of certain mental health anddrug counselors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 207; Eff: 09/10/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2041s and 2047s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 9 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-2041s and 2019-2047s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2019-2047s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2041s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2041s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 239 from the Consent Calendar; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2041s, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | ==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 05/16/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 05/15/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0011h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 15 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0011h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 15 |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0011h (NT) for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 10 |
2019-01-31 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-23 | House | Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 42 |