NH HB226 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing municipalities to borrow from any fund controlled by such municipality under certain conditions.
Title
Allowing municipalities to borrow from any fund controlled by such municipality under certain conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 37 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 10-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-09-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-08-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 213 |