NH HB214 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a public school facility condition assessment and school building aid grants.
Title
Relative to a public school facility condition assessment and school building aid grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Special Order to the next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/24/2022; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2225h New Title 11/09/2021 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 27 |
2021-10-05 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/01/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2021-02-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93534264563 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day time permitting from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB214 (Carry Over) 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207