NH HB214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school building aid grants.
Title
Relative to school building aid grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/01/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2021-02-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93534264563 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day time permitting from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB214 (Carry Over) 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207