NH HB209 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the relinquishment of firearms as a condition of bail.
Title
Relative to the relinquishment of firearms as a condition of bail.
Sponsors
Rep. George Lambert [R] | Rep. Jordan Ulery [R] | Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Timothy Comerford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.751 |
2013-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.502 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.187 |