NH HB197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of deadly force in defense of another.
Title
Relative to the use of deadly force in defense of another.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] |
Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Jennifer Rhodes [R] | Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - Reconsider (Y: 141 N: 207 NV: 15 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 144 NV: 12 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 206 N: 144 NV: 12 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/13/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/06/2021, 01:30 PM; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-25 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Binford): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 141-207 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 7 |
2021-02-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-144 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 4 |
2021-02-25 | House | Amendment # 2021-0249h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/25/2021 House Journal 4 P. 4 |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0249h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 25 |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98584313159 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 38 |
Same As/Similar To
HB197 (Carry Over) 2021-05-13 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15