NH HB175 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 290; Eff: 09/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 290; Eff: 09/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the requirements for school building aid grants.
Title
Relative to the requirements for school building aid grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 290; Eff: 09/27/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2642e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2642e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2229s (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 3 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2229s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2019-2229s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0191h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 6 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0191h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 6 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0191h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 3 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 40 |