NH HB169 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 160; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 160; Effective Date 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to table stakes poker.
Title
Relative to table stakes poker.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Rerefer to Committee (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 160; Effective Date 7/1/2015 |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG. 1989 |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/4/2015); Senate Journal 18 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/14/15, Room 103, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 808 |
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 157-204; House Journal 24, PG. 808 |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 409 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-09 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 2/13/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/9/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202=RECESSED= |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 210 |