NH HB1671 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an office of inspector general.
Title
Establishing an office of inspector general.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Marple [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Donald McClarren [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
Rep. Paul Ingbretson [R] | Rep. Joseph Lachance [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 6 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/10/2016 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 4 |
2016-01-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/03/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-01-28 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/03/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-01-28 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/27/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building306 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 4 P. 22 |