NH HB1668 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-144 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-144 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a background check prior to any commercial firearm sale.
Title
Requiring a background check prior to any commercial firearm sale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 179 N: 144 NV: 27 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-144 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-02-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2022 09:45 am State House Reps Hall |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |