NH HB166 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB166
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 319-53 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 319-53 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the elimination of useful thermal energy from renewable energy classes.
Title
Relative to the elimination of useful thermal energy from renewable energy classes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 319-53 01/04/2024 House Journal 2 P. 38 |
2023-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB166 11/06/2023 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 44 |
2023-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 43 |
2023-09-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-02-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
HB166 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36