NH HB1653 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 310; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 310; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to educational and employment opportunities and protections for military families and their dependents and relative to temporary licenses for emergency and advanced emergency care providers.
Title
Relative to educational and employment opportunities and protections for military families and their dependents and relative to temporary licenses for emergency and advanced emergency care providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 310; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2112EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2112e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Moffett): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1368s and 2022-1690s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Prentiss Floor Amendment # 2022-1690s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1368s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1368s, 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1368s, 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Hearing: 03/08/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-25 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/21/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |