NH HB1653 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Laid On The Table (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Division Vote 238-59; House Journal 32, PG.1886-1887
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - House Laid On The Table (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Division Vote 238-59; House Journal 32, PG.1886-1887
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the rights of conscience for medical professionals.
Title
Relative to the rights of conscience for medical professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House Laid On The Table (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Division Vote 238-59; House Journal 32, PG.1886-1887 | |
2012-02-23 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 25, PG.1511-1512 | |
2012-02-23 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 28 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.1511-1512 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2012-01-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2012 1:31 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-01-18 | House Public Hearing: 1/24/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-12-23 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 7, PG.363 |