NH HB165 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to department of energy procedures in lieu of meeting renewable portfolio standards for biomass.
Title
Relative to department of energy procedures in lieu of meeting renewable portfolio standards for biomass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB165 01/31/2023 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |