NH HB1593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 191; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 191; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a school district meeting to adopt an article authorizing the trustees of the trust fund to charge certain expenses against capital reserve funds.
Title
Authorizing a school district meeting to adopt an article authorizing the trustees of the trust fund to charge certain expenses against capital reserve funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 191; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1653e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1653e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 43 |
2018-02-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/27/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Municipal and County Government 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 16 |